Chou, George (CPSO#: 68013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 509
18 Kensington Road
Bramalea ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 799-9875
Fax: (289) 298-5339
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Chou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chou ( CPSO# 68013 )

Business Address:
509 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 799-9875

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996