Chou, Queena (CPSO#: 66482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B2-443
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 646-6343
Fax: (519) 646-6253
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Care Centre
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St.
London, Ontario
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6343
Fax: (519) 646-6253
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Q. Chou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Chou ( CPSO# 66482 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
Suite B2-443
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4W9
Phone Number: (519) 646-6343

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QUEENA CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1998