Chou, Shirley Hsin Yu (CPSO#: 56251)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018