Chouinard, Edmond Emilien (CPSO#: 50404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 740-4940
Fax: (519) 740-7722
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: (519) 749-4378
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edmond Chouinard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chouinard ( CPSO# 50404 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 740-4940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDMOND EMILIEN CHOUINARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOUINARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1985