Chouinard, Renee Rachel (CPSO#: 61274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6633 Highway 7
Suite 314
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 201-9972
Fax: (905) 201-9932
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Post Office Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Renee Chouinard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chouinard ( CPSO# 61274 )

Business Address:
314 - 6633 Highway Number 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 201-9972

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENEE RACHEL CHOUINARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOUINARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993