Chovanec, Milan (CPSO#: 63566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milan Chovanec Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chovanec ( CPSO# 63566 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILAN CHOVANEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOVANEC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1992