Chow, Allison Ren-Mu (CPSO#: 93771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allison R. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chow ( CPSO# 93771 )
Dr. J. Martin ( CPSO# 103744)

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON REN-MU CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2012