Chow, Andrew (CPSO#: 70321)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 607-8334
Fax: (905) 607-8184
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chow ( CPSO# 70321 )

Business Address:
209 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 607-8334

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 30 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000