Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chow, Benjamin Joe Wade (CPSO#: 69951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696 7286
Fax: (613) 696 7248
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chow ( CPSO# 69951 )

Business Address:
Room H-1220A
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4044

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN JOE WADE CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2001