Chow, Chong John (CPSO#: 63483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Fax: (905) 848-0328
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chong Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chow ( CPSO# 63483 )

Business Address:
West GTA Endoscopy
Unit 183
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7628

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHONG JOHN CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1991