Chow, Chuen-Bik (CPSO#: 26354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
78 Regina Street North
Waterloo ON  N2J 3A5
Phone: (519) 888-6400
Fax: (519) 886-8496
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.-B. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chow ( CPSO# 26354 )

Business Address:
78 Regina Street North
Waterloo ON  N2J 3A5
Phone Number: (519) 888-6400

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 203 99 Northfield Drive Waterloo ON N2K 3P9 Tel: (519) 584-2183
Instructions: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact Dr. Joy Singh
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Oct 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 24, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Chuen-Bik Chow, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chow to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                  Deficiencies in Dr. Chow's practice have been identified. As a result,
                  Dr. Chow must complete Public Health Ontario's course on Reprocessing in
                  Community Health Care Settings; comply with all current guidelines and
                  recommendations set out in Public Health Ontario's course; and submit to
                  a reassessment of her practice six (6) months after the completion of the
                  course. 
                  
                  Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                  Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca.