Chow, Chung-Wai (CPSO#: 60797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
11Pmb 130
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3512
Fax: (416) 340-3109
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Agincourt Pulmonary Services
240 Alton Towers Circle
Suite 208
Scarborough ON  M1V 4P3
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-2613
Fax: (416) 321-6844
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chung-Wai Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chow ( CPSO# 60797 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
11PMB 130
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3512

Business Address:
Agincourt Pulmonary Services
Suite 208
240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough ON  M1V 4P3
Phone Number: (416) 321-2613

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHUNG-WAI CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1990