Chow, Daliah Yuen-Ling (CPSO#: 68737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Bayly Street West
Suite 205
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-2900
Fax: (905) 683-2904
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

95 Bayly Street West
Suite 103
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 428-6495
Fax: (905) 428-6495
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daliah Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chow ( CPSO# 68737 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 683-2900

Business Address:
103 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-6495

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALIAH YUEN-LING CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1997