Chow, Donald (CPSO#: 50405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1983

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Donald Chow
Sports Medicine Clinic
1565 Maple Grove Rd.
Kanata
Ottawa ON  K2V 1A3
Phone: (613) 591-3939
Fax: (613) 591-3265
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chow ( CPSO# 50405 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
1565 Maple Grove Road
Kanata ON  K2V 1A3
Phone Number: (613) 777-4944

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 12, 2010
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario received notice from The Ottawa Hospital of a suspension of privileges held by Dr. Donald Chow. The suspension is effective February 12, 2010 to March 14, 2010.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1983