Chow, Edward Leung Wong (CPSO#: 63311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Chow, Leung Wong (used until: 14 Mar 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiation Oncology
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4974
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward L. W. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chow ( CPSO# 63311 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4998

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD LEUNG WONG CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 11 Aug 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993