Chow, Esther Hoi-Yan (CPSO#: 86716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Don Mills Family Health Team
Unit 200
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 444-6161
Fax: (416) 444-5849
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Esther H. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chow ( CPSO# 86716 )

Business Address:
Don Mills Family Health Team
Unit 200
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 444-6161

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTHER HOI-YAN CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009