Chow, Isabel Jeanette Sophia (CPSO#: 58241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Health Centre (400 Blding)
Suite 364
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 971-0971
Fax: (519) 971-0971
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Isabel Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Chow ( CPSO# 58241 )

Business Address:
Windsor Health Centre
364 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 971-0971

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISABEL JEANETTE SOPHIA CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988