Chow, Janet Allison (CPSO#: 73535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2600
1125 University Drive
Carleton University
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone: 613-520-6674
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chow ( CPSO# 73535 )

Business Address:
Carleton University
2600-1125 University Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone Number: (613) 520-6674

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jul 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ALLISON CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 07 May 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 May 2001 to 07 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2002