Chow, Kan-Yan (CPSO#: 24402)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Health Information Services and Document Storage Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 23 Jun 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2017