Chow, King Yin (CPSO#: 88447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 Alton Towers Circle
Suite 300
Scarborough ON  M1V 3Z3
Phone: 416 663 3937
Fax: 416 663 3731
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Eye Face Institute
Hullmark Centre
4789 Yonge Street
Suite 316
North York ON  M2N 0G3
Canada
Phone: 1 888 883 7503
Fax: 647 797 0224
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Room 410
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3237
Fax: (416) 586-5327
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: King Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chow ( CPSO# 88447 )

Business Address:
Clarity Eye Institute
300 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Toronto ON  M1V 3Z3
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KING YIN CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2014