Chow, Laura Christine (CPSO#: 82774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau-Rockcliffe Family Medicine
595 Montreal Rd, Suite 400
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 695-6900
Fax: (613) 695-6464
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. C. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chow ( CPSO# 82774 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 695-6900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA CHRISTINE CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007