Chow, Lionel Mu-Lo (CPSO#: 71568)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004