Chow, Peter Hong (CPSO#: 25453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter H. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chow ( CPSO# 25453 )

Business Address:
204 - 974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C5
Phone Number: (705) 541-2640

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 4, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Hong Chow, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chow to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                                    DR. PETER HONG CHOW
                                          ("Dr. Chow")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public; 
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Chow, certificate of registration number 25453, am a member of the
                  College.  I acknowledge that I have been advised by the College's
                  Practice Assessment and Enhancement Department that I am required to
                  undergo an assessment of my practice based on my age.  I am aware of the
                  College's concern about protecting the public. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Chow, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (4)   I, Dr. Chow, undertake that as of July 31, 2017, I will not practise
                  medicine in any jurisdiction until each and every one of the following
                  conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine;
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and 
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Chow, undertake that upon my return to the practice of medicine, I
                  shall, at minimum, submit to an assessment of my practice within two (2)
                  months. 

            (6)   I, Dr. Chow, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall
                  forward a request to the General Manager of the OHIP that my billing
                  number be deactivated for services rendered after July 31, 2017 and
                  before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in
                  accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (7)   I, Dr. Chow, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  I also undertake to
                  abide by the College's "Re-entering Practice" Policy, a copy of which is
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B".

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (8)   I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  practise, the College may, among other things: 

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, conditions or limitations
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              As of July 31, 2017, Dr. Chow has ceased to practise medicine
                              in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or
                              provide any medical advice or services. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Chow, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (16)  I, Dr. Chow, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 31, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Hong Chow to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 4, 2017:

As of July 31, 2017, Dr. Chow has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.