Chow, Raphael Kian Thong (CPSO#: 29800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raphael K. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chow ( CPSO# 29800 )

Business Address:
206 - 2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone Number: (905) 881-6667

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 02 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAPHAEL KIAN THONG CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1978