Chow, Sing Wah (CPSO#: 50406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
290 Giles Boulevard East
Windsor ON  N9A 4C2
Phone: (519) 252-4888
Fax: (519) 252-2823
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. W. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chow ( CPSO# 50406 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
290 Giles Boulevard East
Windsor ON  N9A 4C2
Phone Number: (519) 252-4888

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SING WAH CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983