Chow, Stephen Shu-Sum (CPSO#: 31145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 461-0939
Fax: (416) 461-4717
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Canada
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 245
Fax: (416) 279-0857
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Ste 301
607 Gerrard Street
Toronto ON  M4M 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-0939
Fax: (416) 461-4717
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen S. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chow ( CPSO# 31145 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 461-0939

Business Address:
Suite 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone Number: (416) 279-0855

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN SHU-SUM CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Jan 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1982