Chow, Yen Gee (CPSO#: 66746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6100
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. W. Neilipovitz ( CPSO# 61636 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. M. Twiddy ( CPSO# 95507 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. E. Poliakova ( CPSO# 95831 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000


Corporation Name: Yen Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2008


Corporation Name: Yen Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YEN GEE CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1995