Chow, Yun Biu Dominic (CPSO#: 69914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8390 Kennedy Road
Unit B-8
Markham ON  L3R 0W4
Phone: (905) 474-5633
Fax: (905) 474-5133
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. B. Dominic Chow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 69914 )

Business Address:
B8 - 8390 Kennedy Road
Markham ON  L3R 0W4
Phone Number: (905) 474-5633

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUN BIU DOMINIC CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998