Chowdhry, Atif Ahmed (CPSO#: 92219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingsville Family Health Care
273 Main Stret East
Kingsville ON  N9Y 1A7
Phone: (519) 733-2318
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Leamington District Mem Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Chowdhry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chowdhry ( CPSO# 92219 )

Business Address:
Kingsville Family Health Care
273 Main Street East
Kingsville ON  N9Y 1A7
Phone Number: (519) 733-5794

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Mar 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATIF AHMED CHOWDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOWDHRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2013