Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Choy, Alberto Lunyuen (CPSO#: 65006)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2004