Choy, Benjamin Sze Hon (CPSO#: 68209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 22
7010 Warden Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 5Y3
Phone: (905) 477-5677
Fax: (905) 477-2277
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Skin Med Laser Clinic
Unit 5&6
9019 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3M6
Canada
Phone: (905) 886-1110
Fax: (905) 886-9996
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Choy & Tang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2013


Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Choy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Choy ( CPSO# 68209 )

Business Address:
7010 Warden Avenue
Unit 22
Markham ON  L3R 5Y3
Phone Number: (905) 477-5677

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN SZE HON CHOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996