Choy, Ian Chee-Yen (CPSO#: 87307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 314
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 4H8
Phone: (905) 901-1533
Fax: (905) 901-1534
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Choy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Choy ( CPSO# 87307 )

Business Address:
314 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 4H6
Phone Number: (905) 901-1533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN CHEE-YEN CHOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2014