Choy, Stephen Che Kit (CPSO#: 100033)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
JDMI, Toronto General Hospital
Munk Building, 1 PMB-298
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3372
Fax: (416) 593-0502
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN CHE KIT CHOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 05 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017