Chretien, Marc (CPSO#: 105744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 26 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room B9-116
London ON  N6G 2V4
Phone: (519)685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC CHRETIEN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHRETIEN is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. CHRETIEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHRETIEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHRETIEN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHRETIEN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHRETIEN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2015 to 20 Sep 2015
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018