Chripko, Daniel (CPSO#: 60551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: 519-254-5577 Ext. 52201
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Ave.
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Chripko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chripko ( CPSO# 60551 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL CHRIPKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRIPKO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2005