Christian, Michael David (CPSO#: 73846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael D. Christian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Christian ( CPSO# 73846 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID CHRISTIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003