Christie, Neil Alexander (CPSO#: 58279)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 715
5200 Centre Avenue
Pittsburgh PA  15232
United States
Phone: (412) 623-2025
Fax: (412) 623-0329

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiothoracic Surgery Effective: 18 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL ALEXANDER CHRISTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2009