Christie, Suzanne Nadine (CPSO#: 55922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nepean Medical Centre
1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 407
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 562-6390
Fax: (613) 562-6384
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE NADINE CHRISTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1985