Christinck, Evelyn Rosemary (CPSO#: 68100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Petawawa Centennial Family
Health Centre
154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa ON  K8H 3H5
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: (613) 687-6808
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Rosemary Christinck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Christinck ( CPSO# 68100 )

Business Address:
Petawawa Centennial Family
Health Centre
154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa ON  K8H 3H5
Phone Number: (613) 687-7641

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVELYN ROSEMARY CHRISTINCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTINCK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996