Chrom, Vivian Hananiah (CPSO#: 17213)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1958
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1959
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Feb 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003