Chu, Christopher Ping-Wing (CPSO#: 65694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Nottingham, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alice Ho Miu Ling Nethersole
Hospital
11 Chuen On Road
Tai Po New Territories xxx
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 85226892730

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PING-WING CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1997