Chu, David Kin (CPSO#: 58065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5X8
Phone: (905) 358-4913
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KIN CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1988