Chu, Kwok Chun Dennis (CPSO#: 55810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 409
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 498-1555
Fax: (416) 498-9907
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis K. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chu ( CPSO# 55810 )

Business Address:
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 409
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 498-1555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KWOK CHUN DENNIS CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990