Chu, Li (CPSO#: 106602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Feb 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:West China Medical University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for
Addiction and Mental Health
Geriatric Outpatient Program
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416)535 8501
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3660 Midland Avenue
Unit 103
Scarborough ON  M1V 0B8
Canada
Phone: 4162913883
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Li Chu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chu ( CPSO# 106602)

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Geriatric Outpatient Program
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
3660 Midland Avenue
Suite 103
Toronto ON  M1V 0B8
Phone Number: (416) 291-3883

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 18 Oct 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Li  Chu  may  practise  medicine independently in psychiatry and geriatric
            psychiatry.