Chu, Margaret (CPSO#: 74972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone: (416) 536-5555
Fax: (416) 536-3352
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2003