Chu, Melvyn Mau Yuen (CPSO#: 69915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
328 Highway 7 East
Suite 307
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone: (905) 886-0285
Fax: (905) 886-7265
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melvyn M.Y. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chu ( CPSO# 69915 )

Business Address:
307 - 328 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone Number: (905) 886-0285

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELVYN MAU YUEN CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998