Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chu, Michael Wen Kan (CPSO#: 61113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East York Town Centre
45 Overlea Boulevard
Suite B11
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone: (416) 425-4122
Fax: 4164256583
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WEN KAN CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1990