Chu, Peter Tin Yan (CPSO#: 62432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room H186
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5255
Fax: (416) 480-5499
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brenneman Chu Tien Tremblay Nathens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tremblay ( CPSO# 63991 )
Dr. H. Tien ( CPSO# 65162 )
Dr. A. Nathens ( CPSO# 62197 )
Dr. F. Brenneman ( CPSO# 59446 )
Dr. P. Chu ( CPSO# 62432 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite H186
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER TIN YAN CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Mar 1998
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1993