Chu, Robert Wei Xian (CPSO#: 68011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chu ( CPSO# 68011 )

Business Address:
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone Number: (905) 873-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT WEI XIAN CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996