Chua, Grace Liu (CPSO#: 62424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 214
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 832-8665
Fax: (905) 832-8495
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grace Liu Chua Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chua ( CPSO# 62424 )

Business Address:
Suite 214
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 832-8665

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRACE LIU CHUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1992